IL SB2357 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Removes the provisions amending the Illinois Pension Code.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR MISCONDUCT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0552 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeWitte |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-149.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |