IL SB2356 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that each public body shall periodically (currently, specifies no less than semi-annually) meet to review minutes of all closed meetings. Provides that meetings to review minutes shall occur every 6 months, or as soon thereafter as is practicable, taking into account the nature and meeting schedule of the public body. Provides that committees which are ad hoc in nature shall review closed session minutes at the later of (1) 6 months from the date of the last review of closed session minutes or (2) at the next scheduled meeting of the ad hoc committee. Provides that when a public body is dissolved, disbanded, eliminated, or consolidated by executive action, legislative action, or referendum, the governing body of the unit of local government in which the public body was located shall review the closed session minutes of that public body.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-SESSION MINUTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0653 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |