IL SB2356 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the federal No Child Left Behind Act of 2001.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GROW YOUR OWN TEACHER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-23HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2018-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-16SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.25nAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback