IL SB2354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0824
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Service Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
DEGREE PROGRAM ADVICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0824 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 60 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |