IL SB2354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Service Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEGREE PROGRAM ADVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseArrived in House
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire
2018-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-000-000
2018-05-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback