IL SB2354 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Service Education Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEGREE PROGRAM ADVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-22HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseArrived in House
2018-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire
2018-05-17SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-000-000
2018-05-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-15SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105601Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback