IL SB2350 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Career and Workforce Transition Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL LAW ENFORCEMENT DRILL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1101511Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback