IL SB2345 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Includes, as a hate crime, the commission of specified criminal acts against a person because of the actual or perceived citizenship or immigration status of the person. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-HATE CRIME-IMMIGRATI0N
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2345&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2345.htm |