IL SB2345 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Placed on Calendar Total Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning unfair labor practice procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL REPORT CARD-SURVEY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-11-15HouseArrived in House
2018-11-14SenateOverride Governor Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000
2018-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-026-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback