IL SB2344 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Open Meetings Act to collective bargaining negotiations and grievance arbitrations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateTotal Veto Stands
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-26SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 053-000-001
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2018-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-017-000
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-001-001
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-008-002
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115518Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2344&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2344ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2344_04262018_082000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2344_05292018_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2344ham003_05312018_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback