IL SB2344 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Open Meetings Act to collective bargaining negotiations and grievance arbitrations.
Title
SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 053-000-001 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2018-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-017-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-001-001 |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-008-002 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |