IL SB2343 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUMP STOCK/TRIGGER CRANK

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-003-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-010-001
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-18SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-001
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback