IL SB2342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-11-28SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-11-28SenateSenate Concurs
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
2018-11-28Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-11-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2018-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 28, 2018
2018-11-28SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-11-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-11-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-11-28House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-11-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-11-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-11-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-28HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-22HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Raoul
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206461Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2342&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2342ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2342_04242018_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2342_11282018_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2342ham001_11282018_024000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback