IL SB2342 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-28HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-22HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Raoul
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206461Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback