IL SB2341 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUB-SYNTHETIC DRUGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0789
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-09HouseArrived in House
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2018-05-09SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255100-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback