IL SB2340 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-9)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the bill as engrossed, with the following changes: Provides that an advocate and victim's attorney may be exempt from a requirement to exclude a victim's identity in certain records, and removes "parent" from the list of exempt individuals. Provides that a court may for the adult victim's protection and for good cause shown, prohibit any person or agency present in court from further disclosing the adult victim's identity. Provides that a court may prohibit such disclosure only after giving notice and a hearing to all affected parties. Provides that in determining whether to prohibit disclosure of the adult victim's identity the court shall consider: (a) the best interest of the adult victim; and (b) whether such nondisclosure would further a compelling State interest. Provides that the copy of the criminal history record information that is to be provided under a provision concerning criminal sexual offense and school districts shall exclude the identity of the adult victim. Provides that the superintendent shall be restricted from revealing the identity of the adult victim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADULT VICTIM PRIVACY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2021-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-05-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-20HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-14HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2021-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-04-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-04-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2340&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2340ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2340_04232021_032076.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2340_05272021_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2340ham002_05312021_038001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2340ham001_05312021_038000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback