IL SB2339 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-9)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following change: Clarifies language related to restricting the identity of child victims of criminal sexual offenses or alleged criminal sexual offenses by providing that such identity shall be restricted unless a court order is issued authorizing the removal of such restriction of a particular case record or particular records of cases maintained by any circuit court clerk.
Title
PRIVACY OF CHILD VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0651 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 190 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |