IL SB2338 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Student-Athlete Endorsement Rights Act. Sets forth definitions, including "compensation", "student-athlete", and "postsecondary educational institution". Sets forth provisions concerning the conditions in which a student-athlete may and may not earn compensation for the use of the student-athlete's name, image, likeness, or voice while enrolled at a postsecondary education institution. Provides that an institution may impose reasonable limitations on the dates and time that a student-athlete may participate in endorsement, promotional, social media, or other activities related to the license or use of the student-athlete's name, image, likeness, or voice. Provides, among other prohibitions, that no institution, athletic association, conference, or other group or organization with authority over intercollegiate athletic programs shall uphold any contract, rule, or regulation that prevents a student-athlete from earning compensation as result of the use the student-athlete's name, image, likeness, or voice. Provides that a student-athlete's financial aid, awards, and other benefits may not be revoked, reduced, or the terms and conditions altered as a result of the student-athlete receiving compensation. Sets forth other requirements, limitations, and prohibitions on the use of a student-athlete's name, image, likeness, or voice. Sets forth provisions concerning agents, publicity rights, and third party licensees. Sets forth other provisions concerning student-athlete contracts, endorsements, or the promotion of products or services. In liability provisions, provides that no postsecondary educational institution shall be subject to a claim of any kind under the Act. Effective immediately or on July 1, 2021, whichever is later.
Title
SCH CD-CHRONIC TRUANTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0042 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2021 |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-06-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-002-000 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-001-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-018-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-002-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-004-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 3-33.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |