IL SB2333 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Provides that it is unlawful for an employer to require an employee to sign a contract or waiver that would prohibit the employee from disclosing or discussing the employee's wage or salary; however, an employer may prohibit a human resources employee, a supervisor, or any other employee whose job responsibilities require or allow access to other employees' wage or salary information from disclosing such information without prior written consent from the employee whose information is sought or requested. Provides that it is unlawful for an employer to seek the wage or salary history of a prospective employee from the prospective employee or a current or former employer or to require that a prospective employee's prior wage or salary history meet certain criteria, with some exceptions. Provides that an employer against whom an action is brought alleging a violation of the Act's prohibition against gender-based wage differentials and who, within the previous 3 years and prior to the commencement of the action, has completed a self-evaluation of the employer's pay practices and can demonstrate that reasonable progress has been made towards eliminating wage differentials based on gender for the same or substantially similar work in accordance with that evaluation shall have an affirmative defense to liability. Provides that an employer who cannot demonstrate that the evaluation was reasonable in detail and scope shall not be entitled to an affirmative defense, but is liable for any civil fine of: (1) up to $500 per employee affected, if the employer has fewer than 4 employees; or (2) up to $2,500 per employee affected, if the employer has 4 or more employees.
Title
EQUAL PAY DISCLOSE PAY AMOUNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 112 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2333&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2333.htm |