IL SB2332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Minors and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Changes the name of the Act to the Prevention of Tobacco Use by Persons under 21 Years of Age and Sale and Distribution of Tobacco Products Act. Raises the age for whom tobacco products, electronic cigarettes, and alternative nicotine products may be sold from at least 18 years of age to at least 21 years of age. Eliminates the penalty for possession of a cigar, cigarette, smokeless tobacco, or tobacco in any of its forms by persons under 18 years of age. Defines "electronic cigarette". Repeals the Smokeless Tobacco Limitation Act. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOBACCO PRODUCTS-UNDER 21

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-07SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-002-000
2018-02-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23553-12Amended CodeCitation Text
23556-16.1Amended CodeCitation Text
351306Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-25Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-615Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-710Amended CodeCitation Text
7206750.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751Amended CodeCitation Text
7206751.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
7206752Amended CodeCitation Text
720675Act titleAmended CodeCitation Text
72067710Amended CodeCitation Text
72067715Amended CodeCitation Text
7206775Amended CodeCitation Text
7206781Amended CodeCitation Text
7206785Amended CodeCitation Text
7206786Amended CodeCitation Text
7206787Amended CodeCitation Text
7206788Amended CodeCitation Text
720680ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7206852Amended CodeCitation Text
7206854Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback