IL SB2330 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-12)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the publication requirement in a petition for change of name shall be waived if: (i) the petitioner is 18 years of age or older; (ii) concurrent with the petition, the petitioner files with the court a statement, verified under oath, attesting that the petitioner is or has been a person protected under the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986, the Stalking No Contact Order Act, the Civil No Contact Order Act, the stalking provisions of the Criminal Code of 2012, or a similar provision of a law in another state or jurisdiction; (iii) the petitioner attaches to the statement any supporting documents, including relevant court orders; and (iv) the circuit court, after reviewing the statement and supporting documents, enters an order waiving publication. Provides that, under certain circumstances, the petitioner's address may be omitted from court documents and the petitioner may designate an alternative address for service. Provides that court administrators may allow domestic abuse advocates to assist petitioners in the preparation of certain name change petitions. Provides that if publication requirements have been waived, the circuit court shall enter an order providing that any system operated by the judiciary that is designed to provide public case information electronically shall not make the petition publicly available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NAME CHANGE-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0788
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-03-23HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-21HouseArrived in House
2018-02-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018
2018-02-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-07SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
735521-103Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback