IL SB2330 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-12)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-12)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that the publication requirement in a petition for change of name shall be waived if: (i) the petitioner is 18 years of age or older; (ii) concurrent with the petition, the petitioner files with the court a statement, verified under oath, attesting that the petitioner is or has been a person protected under the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986, the Stalking No Contact Order Act, the Civil No Contact Order Act, the stalking provisions of the Criminal Code of 2012, or a similar provision of a law in another state or jurisdiction; (iii) the petitioner attaches to the statement any supporting documents, including relevant court orders; and (iv) the circuit court, after reviewing the statement and supporting documents, enters an order waiving publication. Provides that, under certain circumstances, the petitioner's address may be omitted from court documents and the petitioner may designate an alternative address for service. Provides that court administrators may allow domestic abuse advocates to assist petitioners in the preparation of certain name change petitions. Provides that if publication requirements have been waived, the circuit court shall enter an order providing that any system operated by the judiciary that is designed to provide public case information electronically shall not make the petition publicly available.
Title
NAME CHANGE-DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0788 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-17 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-03-23 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 21-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |