IL SB2329 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Massage Licensing Act. Defines "sexual misconduct". Provides that it is a violation if an owner or manager of a massage establishment knows or reasonably suspects that an employee has committed sexual misconduct against another person on the premises of, or on behalf of, the massage establishment and fails to report to the appropriate law enforcement agency. Provides that a person in violation of the provisions is subject to a fine of not more than $1,500 for each unreported case or revocation of his or her massage therapy license, or both. Increases the fine in instances in which the violator is 17 years of age or older and holds a position of trust, authority, or supervision against a victim between 13 and 18 years old. Provides that it is a violation if an owner or manager of a massage establishment fails to display the policies and procedures relating to sexual misconduct in a manner visible to customers of the massage establishment. Provides injunctive relief available upon the second or subsequent violation of the provisions. Provides that nothing in the provisions requires a law enforcement officer to whom a report of sexual misconduct is made to investigate or charge an individual without the consent of the alleged victim. Provides that a violation of the provisions by a licensed massage therapist is grounds for discipline by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation.
Title
MASSAGE-SEXUAL MISCONDUCT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 57 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 57 | 47 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2329&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2329.htm |