IL SB2328 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that a political subdivision may waive the public hearing, evaluation procedure, and selection procedure for the selection of architectural, engineering, or land surveying services in an emergency situation for a project that is expected to cost less than $150,000 (currently, $25,000). Provides that this amount shall be increased annually by a percentage equal to the annual unadjusted percentage increase, if any, as determined by the consumer price index-u.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV PROFESSIONAL SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-020-001
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 006-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
505108Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback