IL SB2328 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0968
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that a political subdivision may waive the public hearing, evaluation procedure, and selection procedure for the selection of architectural, engineering, or land surveying services in an emergency situation for a project that is expected to cost less than $150,000 (currently, $25,000). Provides that this amount shall be increased annually by a percentage equal to the annual unadjusted percentage increase, if any, as determined by the consumer price index-u.
Title
LOCAL GOV PROFESSIONAL SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0968 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-020-001 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Government Reform; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |