IL SB2327 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board must provide a licensed establishment, licensed truck stop establishment, licensed fraternal establishment, or licensed veterans establishment that violates the Act written notice of the violation within 15 days after the violation. Provides that video gaming terminals in a licensed truck stop establishment must be located in an area restricted to persons over 21 years of age and the entrance to the area must be within the view of at least one employee of the establishment who is over 21 years of age, or monitored through a closed circuit television monitor located on the premises and within the direct view of at least one employee of the establishment who is over 21 years of age (rather than located in an area restricted to persons over 21 years of age the entrance to which is within the view of at least one employee, who is over 21 years of age, of the licensed truck stop establishment). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING-VIOLATION NOTICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseTo Gaming Subcommittee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-003-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 013-000-000
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Gaming; 013-000-000
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304043New CodeSee Bill Text
2304058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback