IL SB2326 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board shall establish a policy and standards for compliance operations to investigate whether a licensed establishment, licensed fraternal establishment, licensed veterans establishment, or a licensed truck stop establishment is permitting any person under the age of 21 years to use or play a video gaming terminal in violation of the Act or furnishing alcoholic liquor to persons under 21 years of age in violation of the Liquor Control Act. Contains provisions concerning the content of the policy and standards. Provides that a licensed establishment, licensed fraternal establishment, licensed veterans establishment, or licensed truck stop establishment that is the subject of an enforcement action under these provisions and is found, pursuant to the enforcement action, to be in compliance with the Act shall be notified by the Board that no violation was found within 30 days after the finding. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VIDEO GAMING ACT-ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Gaming; 012-001-000
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Gaming
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2304079.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback