IL SB2325 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for non-emergency ground ambulance claims properly denied under the policy of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services at the time the claim is filed due to failure to submit a valid Medical Certification for Non-Emergency Ambulance on and after December 15, 2012 and prior to January 1, 2021, the Department shall allot $2,000,000 to a pool to reimburse such claims if the provider proves medical necessity for the service by other means. Requires providers to submit any such denied claims for which they seek compensation to the Department no later than December 31, 2021 along with documentation of medical necessity. Provides that no later than May 31, 2022, the Department shall determine for which claims medical necessity was established. Provides that such claims for which medical necessity was established shall be paid at the rate in effect at the time of the service, provided the $2,000,000 is sufficient to pay at those rates. Provides that if the pool is not sufficient, claims shall be paid at a uniform percentage of the applicable rate such that the pool of $2,000,000 is exhausted. Provides that the appeal process described in a specified provision of the Code shall not be applicable to the Department's determinations. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-AMBULANCE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0650 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 021-000-000 |
2021-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Feigenholtz |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Medicaid |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |