IL SB2324 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Tourism Marketing and Recovery District Law. Provides that a governmental unit (a municipality, county, township, or any combination thereof) may, by ordinance, initiate proceedings to create a tourism marketing and recovery district that would allow a transaction charge to be imposed upon customer transactions entered into by tourism businesses in the district and such charges may be based on revenue, sales, or any other business-related factor deemed appropriate by the governing body. Provides that the transaction charge collected by the governmental unit shall be remitted to a tourism and convention bureau to be used for marketing, promotions, sales efforts, events, and other activities that are reasonably related to the enhancement of tourism. Provides for the creation of a district plan, public hearing requirements, requirements of an ordinance forming a district, annual reports, modification of a district plan, expiration and renewal, termination, and challenges to the validity of the creation of the district or transaction charges. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOURISM MARKETING&RECOVERY LAW

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-23SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to State Government
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback