IL SB2320 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Allows (rather than requires) non-home rule municipalities to operate a code hearing unit under the Administration Adjudication Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes conforming changes.
Title
MUNI CD-ADMIN ADJUDICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0260 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske |
2023-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 016-000-000 |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Local Government |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |