IL SB2315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Prohibits a school district employee or volunteer or an independent contractor of a school district from placing a student in seclusion; defines seclusion. Provides that this prohibition does not apply to the use of seclusion in a court-ordered placement, other than a placement in an educational program of a school district, or in a placement or facility to which other laws or rules apply. Requires State Board of Education rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SECLUSION PROHIBITED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-11-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |