IL SB2314 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the regulation of the possession or ownership of assault weapons are exclusive powers and functions of each municipality (rather than this State). Eliminates existing preemption provision concerning the regulation of assault weapons.
Title
ASSAULT WEAPONS-MUNICIPALITY
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-005-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2314&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2314.htm |