IL SB2313 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that ten dollars of the differential shall be placed either in a county animal population control fund (rather than or the State's Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that the dog's owner shall pay a $25 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund or the county pet population control fund (rather than $20 of which shall be deposited into the Pet Population Control Fund and $5 of which shall be retained by the county or municipality). Deletes language providing that an animal control agency shall assist and share information with the Director of Public Health in the collection of public safety fines. Provides that the owner of a biting animal must also remit a $25 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than to the Department of Public Health, for deposit into the Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that if a dog is found to be a vicious dog, the owner shall pay a $100 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than the Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that if a dog is deemed dangerous, a $50 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than the Pet Population Control Fund). Amends the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act. Deletes language providing that the Director of Public Health must make an annual written report relative to the progress of the program to the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the Governor. Makes changes to the definitions of "Director" and "Department". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-COUNTY ANIMAL FUNDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0787
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date August 10, 2018
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-003-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510510Amended CodeCitation Text
510513Amended CodeCitation Text
510515Amended CodeCitation Text
510515.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51053Amended CodeCitation Text
51059Amended CodeCitation Text
5109210Amended CodeCitation Text
5109220Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback