IL SB2312 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a provision of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act concerning the deceptive marketing, advertising, and sale of mental health disorder and substance use disorder treatment. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for any person to solicit, offer, or enter into an arrangement under which a patient seeking mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment is referred to a mental health disorder or substance use disorder treatment program or facility in exchange for a fee or any other remuneration. Provides that it is not an unlawful practice for programs and facilities to enter into personal services agreements or management services agreements with third parties that do not take into account the volume or value of referrals. Provides that it is not an unlawful practice for programs or facilities to provide discounts for treatment services to clients as long as the discount is based on financial necessity in accordance with the program's or facility's charity care plan, regardless of referral source or reason. Provides that compensation paid by programs or facilities to their employees and independent contractors related to identifying, locating, and securing referrals to that program or facility is not an unlawful practice if the amount of compensation provided to the employee or independent contractor does not vary based upon the volume or value of such referrals. Effective immediately.
Title
CONSUMER FRAUD-KICKBACKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0550 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2VVV | Amended Code | Citation Text |