IL SB2310 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Rent Control Preemption Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENT CONTROL PREEMPTION ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateSession Sine Die
2019-01-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-17SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50825ActRepealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback