IL SB2309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Deletes language requiring that a conveyance of real property to a trust include evidence of acceptance by the trustee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRUSTS: TRANSFER OF PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-16HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-05-16HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-09HouseTo Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-03-13SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-14SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-07SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-17SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76056.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback