IL SB2309 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0786
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Deletes language requiring that a conveyance of real property to a trust include evidence of acceptance by the trustee.
Title
TRUSTS: TRANSFER OF PROPERTY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0786 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Trusts & Estates Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 5 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |