IL SB2308 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Makes appropriations from the Capital Development Fund to the Department of Veterans' Affairs for capital improvements at the Illinois Veterans’ Home at Quincy .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DVA-ILLINOIS VETERANS? HOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2018-01-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-01-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-17SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-17SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback