IL SB2306 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0869
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities shall be prorated if the person qualifying for the exemption does not occupy the qualified residence as of January 1 of the taxable year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-VETERANS-PRORATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0869
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date August 14, 2018
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Rules Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-11HouseArrived in House
2018-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-08SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback