IL SB2305 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall establish a model business enterprise program for the procurement of contracts by municipalities, counties, and road districts. Provides that, if a municipality, county, or road district received a motor fuel tax distribution totaling more than $1,000,000 in the previous fiscal year, then, in order to receive a distribution for the current fiscal year, that municipality, county, or road district must certify to the Department of Transportation that it has established a minority-owned, women-owned, and veteran-owned business enterprise program that meets or exceeds the requirements of the model program established by the Department of Central Management Services. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL-BUSINESS ENTERPRISE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(d) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |