IL SB2305 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable year 2018 and thereafter, the maximum income limitation under the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE-INCOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-01-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-172Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback