IL SB2304 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on August 11, 1999 by the City of Monmouth. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-CITY OF MONMOUTH
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Randy Frese [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0967 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |