IL SB2303 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0836
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act of the Illinois Municipal Code. Creates a tax increment allocation financing extension for an ordinance adopted on October 23, 1995 by the City of Marion. Effective immediately.
Title
TIF-CITY OF MARION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0836 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date August 13, 2018 |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-002-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-009-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-001-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 13, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |