IL SB2302 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the jurisdiction of the Legislative Ethics Commission and the Legislative Inspector General includes current and former members and employees of the General Assembly for events occurring during their terms of office in the General Assembly, or their periods of employment by the legislative branch of the government. Provides that the changes made by this amendatory Act are declarative of existing law. Effective immediately.
Title
LEGIS ETHICS-FORMER MEMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 25-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2302&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2302.htm |