IL SB2299 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a person elected to any township position, including, but not limited to, a trustee, a supervisor, a highway commissioner, a clerk, an assessor, or a collector, shall not be employed by the township in any other capacity other than his or her elected position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTED TWP OFFICIALS-EMPLOYEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Local Government
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateSecond Reading
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-01-31SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
601100-30New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback