IL SB2299 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0868
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, a person elected to any township position, including, but not limited to, a trustee, a supervisor, a highway commissioner, a clerk, an assessor, or a collector, shall not be employed by the township in any other capacity other than his or her elected position.
Title
ELECTED TWP OFFICIALS-EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0868 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-25 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Syverson |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Local Government |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |