IL SB2298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Industrial Hemp Act. Provides that a person desiring to grow, cultivate, or process industrial hemp or industrial hemp products must be licensed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the application for a license shall include the name and address of the applicant and the legal description of the land area, including Global Positioning System coordinates, to be used to cultivate industrial hemp. Provides that the Department may determine, by rule, the duration of a license and the requirements for license renewal. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Noxious Weed Law. Provides that "noxious weed" does not include industrial hemp. Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that "cannabis" does not include industrial hemp. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act.
Title
INDUSTRIAL HEMP ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1091 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2018 |
2018-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-003-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
505 | 100 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 15.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |