IL SB2298 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1091
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Industrial Hemp Act. Provides that a person desiring to grow, cultivate, or process industrial hemp or industrial hemp products must be licensed by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the application for a license shall include the name and address of the applicant and the legal description of the land area, including Global Positioning System coordinates, to be used to cultivate industrial hemp. Provides that the Department may determine, by rule, the duration of a license and the requirements for license renewal. Preempts home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Noxious Weed Law. Provides that "noxious weed" does not include industrial hemp. Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that "cannabis" does not include industrial hemp. Makes conforming changes in the State Finance Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INDUSTRIAL HEMP ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1091
2018-08-26SenateEffective Date August 26, 2018
2018-08-26SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-003-000
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-000-000
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-01-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
5051002Amended CodeCitation Text
72055015.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
7205503Amended CodeCitation Text
7205508Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2298&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2298.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2298eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2298enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1091.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2298sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2298ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2298_04242018_042000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2298_05232018_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2298ham001_05302018_019000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback