IL SB2297 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Governor Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Rescue Squad Districts Act. Provides that a rescue squad district's board of trustees may certify a question to the voters of the district requesting to levy a special tax at a rate not to exceed 0.40% of the value of all taxable property within the district as equalized or assessed by the Department of Revenue for the purpose of providing an ambulance service or supporting an existing ambulance service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESCUE SQUAD DISTRICTS-REVENUE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-009-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-02-21HouseArrived in House
2018-02-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-001-001
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70200511.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback