IL SB2297 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1120
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rescue Squad Districts Act. Provides that a rescue squad district's board of trustees may certify a question to the voters of the district requesting to levy a special tax at a rate not to exceed 0.40% of the value of all taxable property within the district as equalized or assessed by the Department of Revenue for the purpose of providing an ambulance service or supporting an existing ambulance service.
Title
RESCUE SQUAD DISTRICTS-REVENUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1120 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 098-010-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 051-002-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-009-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-02-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-001-001 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |